Lam, Vincent H C (CPSO#: 73979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Coderix Medical Clinic
69 Queen Street East, First Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Phone: 416 640 2384
Fax: 416 981 8842
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent H.C. Lam and Margarita K. Lam Antoniades Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam Antoniades ( CPSO# 76533 )
Dr. V. Lam ( CPSO# 73979 )

Business Address:
St. James Town Health Centre
Ground Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3096

Business Address:
True North Medical Centre
1st Floor
69 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 640-2389

Business Address:
720 King Street West
Unit 7
Toronto ON  M6K 1E6
Phone Number: (416) 963-9338

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT H C LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 28 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001