Lam, Wilson (CPSO#: 93359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 University Avenue
6-608
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 3947
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wilson Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lam ( CPSO# 93359 )

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
Unit 6-608
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILSON LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2015 to 03 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015