Lam, Yuet Ming (CPSO#: 109097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham ON  L6B1B6
Phone: 905-471-9999
Fax: 905-209-1501
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P6
Canada
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUET MING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018