Lambe, Shahid Abdul Razak (CPSO#: 87992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Mumbai, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care Hamilton
McMaster Institute of Urology
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6014
Fax: 905-521-6150
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahid Lambe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lambe ( CPSO# 87992 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
McMaster Institute of Urology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room G345
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHID ABDUL RAZAK LAMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 15 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018