Lamorena, Kristine (CPSO#: 90826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: 4164318164
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristine Lamorena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lamorena ( CPSO# 90826 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Campus
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue West
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINE LAMORENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMORENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012