Lampton, Lucius Marion (CPSO#: 87469)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 12 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mississippi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2015