Landolt-Marticorena, Carolina Maria (CPSO#: 74006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: Landolt Marticorena, Carolina (used until: 04 Oct 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
344 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1W9
Phone: (416) 913-7741
Fax: (416) 964-2121
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Landolt-Marticorena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Landolt-Marticorena ( CPSO# 74006 )

Business Address:
209 - 344 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1W9
Phone Number: (416) 913-7741

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 29 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINA MARIA LANDOLT-MARTICORENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDOLT-MARTICORENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004