Lane, Jeremy Joseph (CPSO#: 73455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY JOSEPH LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004