Lange, Arney Harry (CPSO#: 88573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quality Medical Clinic
1375 Baseline Road
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K2C 3G1
Phone: 613-627-3901
Fax: 613-627-3902
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rideau-Rockcliffe Family Medicine
595 Montreal Rd., Suite 400
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Canada
Phone: 613-695-6900
Fax: 613-695-6464
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Lange Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lange ( CPSO# 88573 )

Business Address:
1375 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 627-3901

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARNEY HARRY LANGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2015