Langlais, Sonia (CPSO#: 72434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tamworth Retrieval Service
Weatpac Rescue Helicopter Base
50 Basil Brown Drive
Tamworth 2340
Australia
Phone: +61422908133
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dean Street
North Tamworth 2340
Australia
Australia
Phone: +61422908133
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA LANGLAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLAIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2003