Laniel, Christian (CPSO#: 90972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans
Orleans, Ontario
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone: 613-841-5389
Fax: 613-841-5393
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christian Laniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Laniel ( CPSO# 90972 )

Business Address:
1220 Promenade Place D'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 841-5389

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN LANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Aug 2011 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012