Lansang, Maria Perla Lucila Estevez Tecson (CPSO#: 81238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

45 Mill St.
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Perla Lansang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lansang ( CPSO# 81238 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
M100-2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Phone Number: (416) 869-3376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 20 Jan 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA PERLA LUCILA ESTEVEZ TECSON LANSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 09 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2007 to 09 Mar 2008
International Specialist Physician - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2013