Lapner, Peter (CPSO#: 70602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Box 502, W 1648
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8377
Fax: (613) 737-8837
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Black and Lapner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Black ( CPSO# 69881 )
Dr. P. Lapner ( CPSO# 70602 )

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Box 502, W 1648
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8377

Business Address:
Shirley Greenberg Women's
Health Centre
Riverside Campus 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LAPNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 23 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 20 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001