Lapointe, Luc Paul Jacques (CPSO#: 82573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
211 Pretoria Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 1X1
Phone: (613) 421-7580
Fax: (613) 230-2316
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lapointe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lapointe ( CPSO# 82573 )

Business Address:
211 Pretoria Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 1X1
Phone Number: (613) 421-7580

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUC PAUL JACQUES LAPOINTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPOINTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009