Lapointe-Milot, Korine (CPSO#: 96876)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2013