Lara Corrales, Irene (CPSO#: 83567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 204864
Fax: (416) 813-7909
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 07 Oct 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Irene Lara Corrales may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr. Lara Corrales
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of  Associate  Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically  expires  when Dr. Lara
                  Corrales no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.