Larios, Oscar Ernesto (CPSO#: 91769)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010