Laroye, Guy Jean (CPSO#: 22926)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:Ghent University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mills Memorial Hospital Department of Anatomic Pathology 4720 Haugland Ave Terrace, BC V8G 2W7
Date Received: 10 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018