Lash, Nicholas John (CPSO#: 85313)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Exchange Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016