Laskin, Matthew David (CPSO#: 84551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1111 Davis Dr
Unit 39
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8X2
Phone: (905) 954-1000
Fax: (905) 954-1007
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MD Laskin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Laskin ( CPSO# 84551 )

Business Address:
Unit 39
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8X2
Phone Number: (905) 954-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW DAVID LASKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011