Latchford, Kevin Jason (CPSO#: 89189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin J. Latchford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Latchford ( CPSO# 89189 )

Business Address:
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN JASON LATCHFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATCHFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010