Latimer, Bradley Robert (CPSO#: 55521)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.R. Latimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Centre 225 Preston St, Ottawa, ON K1R 7R1
Date Received: 21 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2018