Lau, Alvin Wah Wing (CPSO#: 79920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rapids Family Health Team
Suite 4
1150 Pontiac Drive
Sarnia ON  N7S 3A7
Phone: (519) 339-8949
Fax: (519) 339-9022
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alvin Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lau ( CPSO# 79920 )

Business Address:
Rapids Family Health Team
4 - 1150 Pontiac Drive
Sarnia ON  N7S 3A7
Phone Number: (519) 339-8949

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 02 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 02 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 24, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alvin Wah Wing Lau,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lau to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ALVIN WAH WING LAU
                                          ("Dr. Lau")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lau, certificate of registration number 79920, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that I underwent a reassessment of my practice.
                  The reassessment report received by the College raised concerns about my
                  standard of practice in family medicine. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a period of twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every three months;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the assessor
                        dated March 17, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the period
                        of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within thirthy (30)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   The Canadian Medical Protective Association e-modules on
                              record-keeping;
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.CPSO Medical Records Policy:
                              www.cpso.on.ca/uploadedFiles/policies/policies/policyitems/medical_
                              records.pdf; 
                  
                              
                              2.https://fmf.cfpc.ca/wp-content/uploads/2017/11/F135_Benzodiazepine-Deprescribing-in-the-Elderly_A-community-family-medicine-approach.pdf;
                  
                              
                              3.https://www.canada.ca/en/public-health/services/infectious-diseases/sexual-health-sexually-transmitted-infections/canadian-guidelines/sexually-transmitted-infections/canadian-guidelines-sexually-transmitted-infections-30.html;
                  
                              
                              4.http://www.uptodate.com/contents/nonsteroidal-antiinflammatory-drugs-nsaids-beyond-the-basics;
                  
                              5. Canadian Cardiovascular Society Guidelines for the
                              Management of Dyslipidemia for the Prevention of
                              Cardiovascular Disease in the Adult:
                              http://www.onlinecjc.ca/article/S0828-282X(16)30732-2/pdf;
                  
                              6. Hypertension Canada Prevention and Treatment Guidelines:
                              http://guidelines.hypertension.ca/prevention-treatment/;
                  
                              7. Canadian Diabetes Association Pharmacologic Management of
                              Type 2 Diabetes:  November 2016 Interim Update:
                              http://guidelines.diabetes.ca/browse/chapter13_nov-2016;
                  
                              8. Ontario Immunization Schedule:
                              http://www.health.gov.on.ca/en/public/programs/immunization/static/immunization_tool.html;
                  
                              9. Diabetes Patient Care Flow Sheet:
                              http://www.anl.com/MOHGUIDE/00%20Diabetes%20Management%20Incentive%20-;
                              and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to complete the Professional Education by
                        October 31, 2018 or, if no satisfactory program(s) are available by
                        that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above
                        and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with
                        the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lau, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Lau underwent a reassessment of his practice. As a result
                              of the reassessment:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Lau has voluntarily entered into an
                                          Undertaking with the College providing that he
                                          will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                          Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12
                                          months. 
                                    *     Dr. Lau's practice will be reassessed by an
                                          assessor selected by the College approximately
                                          6months after the end of the period of Clinical
                                          Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Lau, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Lau, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Lau, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Dec 2013
Summary:

On December 2, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alvin Wah Wing Lau, a family 
physician, committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, 
would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.   
  
On August 21, 2007, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lau had committed an act of 
professional misconduct and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in that 
he failed to conduct a physical examination of four obstetrical patients and did not take a history 
of three of those patients, but noted on the patient record that he had done so.  
On August 21, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
3. Dr. Lau appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
4. The Registrar suspend Dr. Lau’s certificate of registration for a period of twelve (12) 
   months.  The suspension shall commence at 12:01 am on September 1, 2007. 
 
5. Four (4) months of the suspension referred to in paragraph 2 shall be suspended provided 
   Dr. Lau meets the following conditions: 
 
      (a) Dr. Lau will successfully complete, at his own expense, a Medical Ethics Course 
         organized through the College’s Quality Management Division; 
      (b) Dr. Lau will successfully complete, at his own expense, the Physician-Patient 
         Communication Skills Course offered by the College or, in the alternative, a 
         comparable course organized through the College; and 
      (c) Dr. Lau will continue to abide by the following terms, conditions and limitations, 
         which are set out in the s. 37 Order dated August 8, 2006: 
 
         i. Dr. Lau, at his own expense, shall cause a monitor to be present during his 
           appointments with all patients at his office practice and walk-in clinic; 
         ii. That monitor shall be a member of a health profession pursuant to the terms of the 
           Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18 as amended, who is 
           acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons (the “College”); 
        iii. That monitor shall review each of Dr. Lau’s chart entries to ensure that they 
           accurately represent the appointment proceedings and will countersign the entry 
           with Dr. Lau; 
        iv. At all times, Dr. Lau shall ensure that the monitor keeps a log of each patient seen.  
           The log shall contain the name of the patient and the date of the encounter; 
         v. Dr. Lau shall ensure that the monitor provides to the College a copy of the log 
           during the previous month, by facsimile on the 1st of each and every month; 
        vi. Dr. Lau, at his own expense, shall cause a member of the College of Physicians 
           and Surgeons, who is acceptable to the College, to review his patient charts on a 
           daily basis (the “Chart Review”); 
        vii. The physician conducting the Chart Review shall provide to the College a 
           monthly update on Dr. Lau’s charts and the appropriateness of the care provided 
           to Dr. Lau’s patients by Dr. Lau as indicated in the charts; 
       viii. Dr. Lau shall co-operate with the monitor and the physician conducting the Chart 
           Review and not interfere with their abilities to perform their respective functions, 
           including allowing them free access to his charts; 
        ix. Both the monitor and physician conducting the Chart Review shall report to the 
           Registrar of the College immediately any and all irregularities they may 
           encounter; 
         x. Dr. Lau shall provide a signed consent allowing the College to have access to his 
           OHIP billings; and, 
        xi. Dr. Lau shall co-operate with, unannounced inspections of his office(s) and 
           practices(s) and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of 
           monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
 
6.  The Registrar impose the terms, conditions and limitations set out in paragraph 3(c) above 
    on Dr. Lau’s certificate of registration.  Dr. Lau may apply for the terms of this Order to be 
    varied as of August 21, 2012.  If Dr. Lau makes such an application, he will provide the 
    results of a practice assessment arranged by and acceptable to the College to be completed 
    at Dr. Lau’s expense.  Dr. Lau may request such a practice assessment any time after 
    February 21, 2012 and the College agrees to make reasonable efforts to arrange and 
    complete the practice assessment within the six month period after Dr. Lau initiates the 
    request. 
7.  Dr. Lau pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within thirty (30) days of the 
    date of this Order. 
8.  The results of this proceeding be included in the register. 
 
At the discipline hearing on December 2, 2013, Dr. Lau admitted that he failed to comply with 
the terms, conditions and limitations imposed by the Discipline Committee on his certificate of 
registration on August 21, 2007, in that he permitted the monitor to be absent from the room in 
response to specific patient requests. Dr. Lau admitted that such conduct was unprofesssional 
and thereby constituted an act or omission relevant to the practice of midince that, having regard 
to all of the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional by members of the profession. The parties agreed that the 
conduct should be characterezed as unprofessional. Dr. Lau also admitted that he did not seek 
guidance or advice from the College regarding compliance with the 2007 Order of the Discipline 
Committee where a patient requested that the monitor not be present and he did not apply to vary 
the terms of the Order of the Discipline Committee to address situations where a patient 
requested that the monitor not be present.  
  
The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Lau’s admission and found that his conduct constituted 
professional misconduct.  
  
On December 2, 2013, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On February 
5, 2014, the Discipline Commitee ordered and directed that:  
 
  -  Dr. Lau appear before the panel to be reprimanded.  
  -  Dr. Lau pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460 within thirty (30) days from the 
     date of this Order  
  
On December 2, 2013, Dr. Lau made a motion to vary the Committee s Order of August 21,  
2007. The Discipline Committee reserved its decision on the motion. On February 5, 2014, the  
Discipline Committee denied Dr. Lau’s motion to vary the Committee s Order of August 21,  
2007.  
  
On May 2, 2018, Dr. Lau made a further motion to vary the Committee’s Order of August 21,  
2007. On May 2, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that the Order of the 
Discipline Committee dated August 21, 2007 be varied, removing the terms, conditions and 
limitations on Dr. Lau's Certificate of Registration set out at paragraph 5(c).

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 2, 2013


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Aug 2007
Summary:

On August 21, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lau to have committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession 
and that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regarding to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1.    The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Lau to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.   The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Lau s certificate of 
     registration for a period of twelve (12) months.   The suspension shall commence at 12:01 
     am on September 1, 2007. 
 
3.   The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar that (4) months of the suspension shall be 
     suspended provided Dr. Lau meets the following conditions: 
 
     (a)    Dr. Lau will successfully complete, at his own expense, a Medical Ethics Course 
            organized through the College s Quality Management Division; 
 
     (b)    Dr. Lau will successfully complete, at his own expense, the Physician-Patient 
            Communication Skills Course offered by the College or, in the alternative, a 
            comparable course organized through the College; and 
 
     (c)    Dr. Lau will continue to abide by the following terms, conditions and limitations 
            which were set out in the s.37 order dated August 8, 2006: 
 
            i)    Dr. Lau, at his own expense, shall cause a monitor to be present during his 
                  appointments with all patients at his office practice and walk-in clinic; 
 
            ii)   That monitor shall be a member of a health profession pursuant to the 
                  terms of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18 as 
                  amended, who is acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
                  (the College ); 
 
            iii)  That monitor shall review each of Dr. Lau s chart entries to ensure that 
                  they accurately represent the appointment proceedings and will 
                  countersign the entry with Dr. Lau; 
 
            iv)   At all times, Dr. Lau shall ensure that the monitor keeps a log of each 
                  patient seen.  The log shall contain the name of the patient and the date of 
                  the encounter; 
 
            v)    Dr. Lau shall ensure that the monitor provides to the College a copy of the 
                  log during the previous month, by facsimile on the 1st of each and every 
                  month;  
 
             
            vi)   Dr. Lau, at his own expense, shall cause a member of the College of 
                  Physicians and Surgeons, who is acceptable to the College, to review his 
                  patient charts on a daily basis (the Chart Review ); 
 
            vii)  The physician conducting the Chart Review shall provide to the College a 
                  monthly update on Dr. Lau s charts and the appropriateness of the care 
                  provided to Dr. Lau s patients by Dr. Lau as indicated in the charts; 
 
            viii) Dr. Lau shall co-operate with the monitor and the physician conducting the 
                  Chart Review and not interfere with their abilities to perform their 
                  respective functions, including allowing them free access to his charts; 
 
            ix)   Both the monitor and physician conducting the Chart Review shall report 
                  to the Registrar of the College immediately any and all irregularities they 
                  may encounter; 
 
            x)    Dr. Lau shall provide a signed consent allowing the College to have access 
                  to his OHIP billings; and 
 
            xi)   Dr. Lau shall co-operate with, unannounced inspections of his office(s) 
                  and practices(s) and patient charts by a College representative for the 
                  purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of 
                  this Order. 
 
4.   The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the terms, conditions and 
     limitations set out in paragraph 3(c) above on Dr. Lau s certificate of registration.  Dr. Lau 
     may apply for the terms of this Order to be varied as of August 21, 2012.  If Dr. Lau 
     makes such an application, he will provide the results of a practice assessment arranged by 
     and acceptable to the College to be completed at Dr. Lau s expense.  Dr. Lau may request 
     such a practice assessment any time after February 21, 2012 and the College agrees to 
     make reasonable efforts to arrange and complete the practice assessment within the six 
     month period after Dr. Lau initiates the request. 
 
5.   The Discipline Committee Orders Dr. Lau to pay to the College costs in the amount of 
     $2,500.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. 
 
6.   The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
     register. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 21, 2007

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 24, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Alvin Wah Wing Lau to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 24, 2018:

Dr. Lau underwent a reassessment of his practice. As a result of the reassessment:

-Dr. Lau has voluntarily entered into an Undertaking with the College providing that he will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
-Dr. Lau’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.