Lau, Arthur Ngar Tat (CPSO#: 88655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 529-1317
Fax: (905) 521-1297
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lau Bacchus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lau ( CPSO# 88655 )
Dr. F. Bacchus ( CPSO# 86326 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
Medical Clinics-2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
Suite 501
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 529-1317

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR NGAR TAT LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012