Lau, Christine Wai-Yun (CPSO#: 97912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Palliative Care
H Wing 3rd Floor - Room H336
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 7255
Fax: 416-480-5146
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lau Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lau ( CPSO# 97912 )
Dr. J. Chung ( CPSO# 97897 )

Business Address:
15 - 300 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6Z9
Phone Number: (905) 509-4595

Business Address:
H336, H Wing 3rd Floor
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE WAI-YUN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 02 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017