Lau, Pamela Pek-Shan (CPSO#: 95756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Lau, Pamela Pekshan (used until: 21 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Markham Medical Centre
9980 Kennedy Road, Suite 9
Markham ON  L6C 0M4
Phone: 905-888-7099
Fax: 905-888-7098
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lau ( CPSO# 95756 )

Business Address:
North Markham Medical Centre
Suite C9
9980 Kennedy Road
Markham ON  L6C 0M4
Phone Number: (905) 888-7099

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA PEK-SHAN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013