Lau, Rick Lichi (CPSO#: 90107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115-675 Queen St. S.
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: (519) 603-0623
Fax: (519) 603-0625
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rick Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lau ( CPSO# 90107 )

Business Address:
115 - 675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICK LICHI LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jan 2009 to 13 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011