Lautatzis, Maria-Elena (CPSO#: 105406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Endocrinology and
Metabolism
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA-ELENA LAUTATZIS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LAUTATZIS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LAUTATZIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LAUTATZIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LAUTATZIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LAUTATZIS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LAUTATZIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Feb 2015 to 04 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2016 to 29 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018