Lauzon, Julie Lynn (CPSO#: 77294)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Feb 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Feb 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2002 to 05 May 2002
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 02 Dec 2002 to 15 Dec 2002
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2002 to 09 Feb 2003
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2003 to 23 Feb 2003
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 2003