Laval, Sharon Michelle (CPSO#: 83547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: American Sign Language, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 695-8901
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree Medical Group
240 Sparks Street
Ottawa ON  K1P 6Z9
Canada
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 695-8901
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Appletree Medical Group
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5C1
Canada
Phone: 6134820118
Fax: 6136958901
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Appletree Medical Group
2573 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3
Canada
Phone: 6134820118
Fax: 6136958901
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1309 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L3
Canada
Phone: 613-482-0118
Fax: 613-695-8901
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Michelle Laval Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Laval ( CPSO# 83547 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5C1
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
4 - 2150 Robertson Road
Nepean ON  K2G 3K2
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
1309 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L3
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
C154 - 240 Sparks Street
Ottawa ON  K1P 6Z9
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
2573 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]


            As from December 13, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sharon Michelle
            Laval, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Laval to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. SHARON MICHELLE LAVAL
                                             ("Dr. Laval")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Laval, certificate of registration number 83547, am a member of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that:

                  (a)   I entered into an Undertaking to the College on February 8, 2011
                        (the "February 2011 Undertaking") as a result of an assessment of
                        my practice;
                  
                  (b)   the College received information about my compliance with the
                        February 2011 Undertaking; and
                  
                  (c)   this Undertaking replaces the February 2011 Undertaking. 
                  
            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 



            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake that effective immediately, I shall not
                        engage in the following areas of practice:
                  
                        (i)   any surgical practice, save and except for surgical assisting
                              in a hospital based setting when a College-approved certified
                              surgeon is performing the surgery, is in attendance, and is
                              the Most Responsible Physician (MRP);
                  
                        (ii)  any hospital-based obstetrical/gynecological practice; and
                  
                        (iii) any labour and delivery practice.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake that I shall conduct only the following
                        procedures in my office practice:
                  
                        (i)   colposcopy with (cervical) biopsies;
                  
                        (ii)  cervical cryotherapy (without LEEP);
                  
                        (iii) IUCD insertions and removal;
                  
                        (iv)  pessary insertion, fitting and change;
                  
                        (v)   endometrial biopsy; and
                  
                        (vi)  depo injections - Provera and Gardasil; and
                  
                        (vii) vulvar biopsies under Clinical Supervision, as set out in
                              this Undertaking and in Appendices "A" and "B".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake that I shall be restricted from performing
                        any procedures in my office practice other than those procedures
                        explicitly named in section (5)(b) above. For further clarity, I
                        may not perform any of the following, without limitation: cone
                        biopsy, LEEP, and balloon or other endometrial ablations.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that I have been subject to the practice
                        restrictions described in sections (5)(a), (5)(b)(i)-(vi), and
                        (5)(c) since February 8, 2011.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for nine (9) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to keep a log of all vulvar biopsies (the
                        "Log") with the corresponding pathology reports.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Have an initial meeting with me to discuss practice
                              improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me and review at least ten (10) to fifteen (15)
                              colposcopy and vulvar biopsy patient charts once every three
                              (3) months;
                  
                        (iv)  At the first meeting, observe my colposcopy clinic for one
                              half day, for care, documentation and infection control
                              practices;
                  
                        (v)   Review each entry in the Log with the corresponding pathology
                              report;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College after each meeting, or
                              more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Laval, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease performing all vulvar biopsies until such
                        time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the
                        College.  
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Laval, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   a program satisfactory to the College in colposcopy; 
                  
                        (ii)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (7)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to complete this requirement within six (6)
                        months of signing this Undertaking or, if no satisfactory program
                        is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laval, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Laval, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  (ii)any
                              recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee
                              has identified in its decision referenced in section (8)(d)
                              as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laval, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laval, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Laval, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Laval, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:


                  The College received information about Dr. Laval's compliance with an
                  undertaking to the College. As a result and further to the prior
                  undertaking:
                  
                        As of February 8, 2011, Dr. Laval shall not engage in the following
                        areas of practice:
                  
                              any surgical practice, save and except for surgical assisting
                              in a hospital
                              based setting when a College-approved certified surgeon is
                              performing the surgery, is in attendance, and is the Most
                              Responsible Physician (MRP);
                  
                              any hospital-based obstetrical/gynecological practice; and
                              any labour and delivery practice.
                  
                        As of February 8, 2011, Dr. Laval shall conduct only the following
                        procedures in her office practice:
                  
                              colposcopy with (cervical) biopsies;
                              cervical cryotherapy (without LEEP);
                              IUCD insertions and removal;
                              pessary insertion, fitting and change;
                              endometrial biopsy; and
                              depo injections - Provera and Gardasil.
                  
                        As of December 13, 2016, Dr. Laval may perform vulvar biopsies
                        under Clinical Supervision in her office practice.
                  
                        As of February 8, 2011, Dr. Laval is restricted from performing any
                        procedures in her office practice other than those procedures
                        explicitly named above. Dr. Laval may not perform any of the
                        following: cone biopsy, LEEP, and balloon or other endometrial
                        ablations.
                  
                        Dr. Laval will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College for 9 months. 
                  
                        Dr. Laval will engage in professional education in colposcopy.
                  
                        Dr. Laval's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Laval, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Laval, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Laval, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (7) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (7) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sharon Michelle Laval to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 13, 2016:

The College received information about Dr. Laval’s compliance with an undertaking to the College. As a result and further to the prior undertaking:

As of February 8, 2011, Dr. Laval shall not engage in the following areas of practice:

any surgical practice, save and except for surgical assisting in a hospital based setting when a College-approved certified surgeon is performing the surgery, is in attendance, and is the Most Responsible Physician (MRP);
any hospital-based obstetrical/gynecological practice; and
any labour and delivery practice.

As of February 8, 2011, Dr. Laval shall conduct only the following procedures in her office practice:

colposcopy with (cervical) biopsies;
cervical cryotherapy (without LEEP);
IUCD insertions and removal;
pessary insertion, fitting and change;
endometrial biopsy; and
depo injections - Provera and Gardasil.

As of December 13, 2016, Dr. Laval may perform vulvar biopsies under Clinical Supervision in her office practice.

As of February 8, 2011, Dr. Laval is restricted from performing any procedures in her office practice other than those procedures explicitly named above. Dr. Laval may not perform any of the following: cone biopsy, LEEP, and balloon or other endometrial ablations.

Dr. Laval will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months.

Dr. Laval will engage in professional education in colposcopy.

Dr. Laval’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.