Lavelle, Philomena Anastasia (CPSO#: 56091)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Date of Death: 15-Mar-2008

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007