Lavigne, Mikael Jacob Katz (CPSO#: 88673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: Katz-Lavigne, Mikhael Jacob (used until: 13 Jan 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics, 3 North
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Fax: 416-756-6152
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G1X8
Canada
Phone: 4168137500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIKAEL JACOB KATZ LAVIGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIGNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012