Law, Angeline (CPSO#: 84068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Cardiology
Room W1683
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8859
Fax: (613) 739-6727
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Law Szeto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Szeto ( CPSO# 76372 )
Dr. A. Law ( CPSO# 84068 )

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room CCW - 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room CCW 1683
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELINE LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2006