Lawlor, Catriona Ann (CPSO#: 81203)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 27 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2006