Lawrence, Kathryn Mary (CPSO#: 91663)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010