Lawson, Maia Gwendolyn Mamen (CPSO#: 95582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meadowlands Family Health Center
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: (613) 228-2856
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAIA GWENDOLYN MAMEN LAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2013