Laxer, Michelle Sara (CPSO#: 90663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Medical Centre
Family Health Team
85 The East Mall
Suite 400
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: 416 621 2220
Fax: 416 621 2203
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE SARA LAXER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAXER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2015