Layne, Elizabeth Cleopatra (CPSO#: 75181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 844-7770
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth C. Layne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Layne ( CPSO# 75181 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 844-7770

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CLEOPATRA LAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006