Layton, Zeinab Alexandra (CPSO#: 73944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58277
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zeinab Layton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Layton ( CPSO# 73944 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Suite 320
Mississauga ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Room B10
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 792-8440

Business Address:
Suite 103
10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6Z 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 846-7733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZEINAB ALEXANDRA LAYTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAYTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006