Lazaro, Bruno Coelho da Rocha (CPSO#: 91176)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010