Lazarou, Jason (CPSO#: 76446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic
Health Complex L2 411 Box 22
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8597
Fax: (416) 586-8623
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Lazarou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lazarou ( CPSO# 76446 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic
Health Complex L2 411 Box 22
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON LAZAROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZAROU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006