Lazier, Joanna Shari (CPSO#: 104703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3726
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Lazier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lazier ( CPSO# 104703)

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA SHARI LAZIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2017