Le Gal, Gregoire (CPSO#: 87848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:UNIVERSITE DE BREST, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8060
Fax: (613) 737-8093
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

France

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Gregoire Le Gal may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Hematology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Le Gal
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires when Dr. Le Gal no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.