Le, Kien Thuan (CPSO#: 60492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4335 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2A5
Phone: 4166958878
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jan 1989 to 26 Feb 1989
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 8, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kien Thuan Le in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Le to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                           DR. KIEN THUAN LE
                                              ("Dr. Le")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Le, certificate of registration number 60492, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215259 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my general medicine
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for twelve (12)
                        months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                              (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                                    Individualized 
                                    Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix
                                    "B";
                  
                              (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have
                                    an initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                                    recommendations;
                  
                              (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another
                                    location approved by the College, once every other
                                    month, for a total of six (6) meetings, in addition to
                                    the initial meeting;
                  
                              (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at
                                    every meeting;
                  
                              (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                              (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements
                                    and ongoing professional development and inquire into
                                    my compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                              (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other
                                    documents or conducting interviews with staff or
                                    colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems
                                    necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and
                  
                              (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once
                                    every other month, or more frequently if the Clinical
                                    Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical
                         Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP,
                        attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern
                        identified in the reports of the medical inspector received by the
                        College October 5, 2017, October 22, 2017 and March 22, 2018, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Le, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Le, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Review, familiarization with and implementation of the
                              current Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer
                              Pain: http://nationalpaincentre. mcmaster.ca/opioid/;
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with Clinical Supervisor each of the
                              following:
                  
                              1.    The narcotics section of College Policy #7-16:
                                    Prescribing Drugs:
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing
                                    -Drugs; 
                  
                              2.    
                                    CollegePolicy#4-12:http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/
                                    Medical-Records;
                  
                              3.    The University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine Medical
                                    Record Keeping Course; 
                  
                        (iii) Review each of the following:
                  
                              1.    the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain Tool:
                                    https://thewellhealth.ca/wp-content/uploads/2017/03/CEP_
                                    CNCP_Main_V1.pdf;
                  
                              2.    Patient health questionnaire (PHQ-9):
                                    https://www2.gov.bc.ca/assets/
                                    gov/health/practitioner-pro/bc-guidelines/depression_patient_health_
                                    questionnaire.pdf;
                  
                              3.    Generalised Anxiety Disorder 7-Item Scale (GAD-7):
                                    https://www.
                                    integration.samhsa.gov/clinical-practice/GAD708.19.08Cartwright.pdf;
                              4.    Antibiotic Use in Upper Respiratory Tract Infections
                                    (November 2012):
                                    https://www.aafp.org/afp/2012/1101/p817.html;
                  
                              5.    Pharmacologic Management of Type 2 Diabetes:  Available
                                    Therapies (2017):
                                    https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0002914917307993
                  
                              6.    Any clinical practice guidelines recommended by my
                                    Clinical Supervisor:
                                    https://www.cma.ca/En/Pages/clinical-practice-guidelines.aspx; 
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to complete this requirement within the period
                        of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that I am required to provide the College
                        with proof that I am participating in a program of continuing
                        professional development that meets the requirements for continuing
                        professional development of the Royal College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or
                        an organization that has been approved by the College for that
                        purpose that meets the requirements for continuing professional
                        development set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                        Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada. 
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Le, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above
                        and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and
                        review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be
                        provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may
                        form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Le, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Le, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                        unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Le, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Le, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Le
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              the practice of general medicine. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Le will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Le will engage in professional education in opioid
                              prescribing, screening for mood disorders, antibiotic use,
                              steroid use, approach to cough with patients taking
                              ACE-Inhibitors, Type 2 diabetes management, clinical
                              assessment of patients and medical record keeping.
                  
                              Dr. Le's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected
                              by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of
                              Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Le, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Le, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Le, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with
                   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                  entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the
                  monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Le, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kien Thuan Le to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 8, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Le engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of general medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Le will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Le will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing, screening for mood disorders, antibiotic use, steroid use, approach to cough with patients taking ACE-Inhibitors, Type 2 diabetes management, clinical assessment of patients and medical record keeping.

Dr. Le’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.