Le, Nam Hoang (CPSO#: 90829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Room 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Eye Institute
340 College St, Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5T3A9
Canada
Phone: 4169282132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Provis Rudd Clinic
123 Edward St, Suite 400
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 4165970997
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nam Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le ( CPSO# 90829 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Room 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Business Address:
340 College Street
Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
123 Edward Street
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-0997

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAM HOANG LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2014