Le, Tran Dao-Bich (CPSO#: 91592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2180 Steeles Ave. W. Suite #221
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone: 905-761-7002
Fax: 905-761-7003
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1849 Yonge Street, Suite 705
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-4433
Fax: (416) 481-7011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Michael's Hospital, Eye Clinic
61 Queen St. East, 8th floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1L 1W1
Canada
Phone: (416) 285-3666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2101 Brimely Road, Suite #109
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-0330
Fax: (416) 292-0331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7 Elmwood Ave.
North York ON  M2N 6R6
Canada
Phone: (647)351-4393
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tran Le and Dr. Eric Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leung ( CPSO# 86310 )
Dr. T. Le ( CPSO# 91592 )

Business Address:
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 221
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
T Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6165

Business Address:
2101 Brimley Road
Suite 109
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
Suite 705
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 481-4433

Business Address:
7 Elmwood Avenue
North York ON  M2N 6R6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRAN DAO-BICH LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014