Le, Vanessa H (CPSO#: 82754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Francophone de Toronto
Suite 303
555 Richmond Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3B1
Phone: (416) 922-2672
Fax: (416) 922-4254
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8A-8290 Hwy #27
Vaughan ON  L4H 0S1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANESSA H LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2016