LeBel, Tania Catherine (CPSO#: 79345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 CF H SVC det Meaford
LFC ATC Meaford
RR #1
Meaford ON  N4L 0A1
Phone: 519-538-6748
Fax: (519) 538-6667
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tania LeBel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. LeBel ( CPSO# 79345 )

Business Address:
31 CF Health Services Det Meaford
R R 1
Meaford ON  N4L 0A1
Phone Number: (519) 538-6748

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA CATHERINE LEBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005