LeBlanc, Guy (CPSO#: 85280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1320 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8H 2W1
Phone: (905) 528-0163
Fax: (905) 528-9001
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUY LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011