LeBlanc, Justin Eugene Matthew (CPSO#: 94910)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Mar 2011 to 10 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013